NY A00454 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that whenever a contiguous property of a college or university contains three hundred or more registrants, the polling place designated for such election district shall be on such contiguous property or at a location approved by the college or university.
Title
Provides that whenever a contiguous property of a college or university contains three hundred or more registrants, the polling place designated for such election district shall be on such contiguous property or at a location approved by the college or university.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | print number 454a |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04658 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - referred to election law