NY A00445 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reducing the use of PFAS chemicals in firefighting activities.
Title
Relates to reducing the use of PFAS chemicals in firefighting activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.61 |
2019-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.702 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.581 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a445a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 439A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-11 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.594 |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s439a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.581 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.581 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 445a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00439 (Same As) 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.61