NY A00373 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-01 - signed chap.2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-01 - signed chap.2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring certain persons providing substance abuse treatment or counseling to complete training in medication assisted treatment.
Title
Relates to requiring certain persons providing substance abuse treatment or counseling to complete training in medication assisted treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | Senate | signed chap.2 |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-01-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-01-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-01-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.14 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S981 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.2 |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.2 |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S00981 (Same As) 2017-01-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A373