NY A00370 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - advanced to third reading cal.550
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - advanced to third reading cal.550
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits fee charges for payment of an account regardless of the method of payment.
Title
Prohibits fee charges for payment of an account regardless of the method of payment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.550 |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.400 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.400 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | print number 370b |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-30 | Assembly | print number 370a |
2013-01-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02432 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES