NY A00367 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that students may be employed for up to five hours on any day preceding a school day as a qualified lifeguard or aquatic supervisory staff, provided that the employer receives and maintains both the written consent of the minor's parent or guardian and a certificate which shall be provided to the employer at the end of each marking period by the minor's school which shall assert that such minor is in satisfactory academic standing.
Title
Provides that students may be employed for up to five hours on any day preceding a school day as a qualified lifeguard or aquatic supervisory staff, provided that the employer receives and maintains both the written consent of the minor's parent or guardian and a certificate which shall be provided to the employer at the end of each marking period by the minor's school which shall assert that such minor is in satisfactory academic standing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.145 |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.145 |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07162 (Same As) 2012-05-01 - REFERRED TO LABOR