NY A00367 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would prohibit landlords to collect incentives and tax credits on properties that violate housing codes.
Title
An act to amend the real property tax law, in relation to prohibiting landlords convicted of housing violations from claiming exemptions, credits or itemized deductions related to such rental property on state tax returns
Sponsors
Asm. Thomas Alfano [R] | Asm. Robert Barra [R] | Asm. Barbara Clark [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] |
Asm. Micah Kellner [D] | Sen. Jose Peralta [D] | Asm. Jack Quinn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | enacting clause stricken | |
2010-01-06 | referred to real property taxation | |
2009-01-07 | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S2591 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
A10501 (Same As) 2010-04-02 - referred to real property taxation
A10501 (Same As) 2010-04-02 - referred to real property taxation