NY A00345 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s2330b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s2330b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the superintendent of financial services to make public any rate filing or application submitted by long term care insurance carriers; requires certain notices be provided to policyholders and certificate holders regarding premium rate increases.
Title
Requires the superintendent of financial services to make public any rate filing or application submitted by long term care insurance carriers; requires certain notices be provided to policyholders and certificate holders regarding premium rate increases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s2330b |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.613 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.613 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 345c |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | print number 345b |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2023-03-31 | Assembly | print number 345a |
2023-03-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2023-01-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02330 (Same As) 2023-11-17 - SIGNED CHAP.655