NY A00339 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the New York State Reuniting Families Act.
Title
Enacts the New York State Reuniting Families Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.31 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.167 |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S02201 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES