NY A00328 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits emergency service providers from selling patient health information without written consent.
Title
Prohibits emergency service providers from selling patient health information without written consent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.30 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | amended on third reading 328a |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.43 |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04372 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH