NY A00311 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would provide funds for elementary or secondary education, from the fund collected by the state lottery.
Title
Regulates the proportional distribution of revenues from the sale of lottery tickets between expenses of the lottery and state education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | enacting clause stricken | |
2010-01-06 | referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-07 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S2215 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
A10727 (Same As) 2010-04-16 - referred to ways and means
A10727 (Same As) 2010-04-16 - referred to ways and means