NY A00304 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that it shall be a defense to a charge of a traffic infraction for running a red light that the police manipulated such device with the purpose of assessing a ticket against an individual.
Title
Provides that it shall be a defense to a charge of a traffic infraction for running a red light that the police manipulated such device with the purpose of assessing a ticket against an individual.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] |
Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. William Scarborough [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.180 |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |