NY A00290 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of children and family services to utilize a cost estimation model when determining the actual cost providers incur when providing child care and requires the office to prepare an annual report detailing such.
Title
Requires the office of children and family services to utilize a cost estimation model when determining the actual cost providers incur when providing child care and requires the office to prepare an annual report detailing such.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.26 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.481 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S01455 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE