NY A00276 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides treatment for sexually transmitted diseases to minors without a parent's or guardian's consent.
Title
Provides treatment for sexually transmitted diseases to minors without a parent's or guardian's consent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | print number 276b |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | print number 276a |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2023-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00762 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH