NY A00263 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that consumers do not have direct access to any product or products containing the active ingredient dextromethorphan prior to sale.
Title
Ensures that consumers do not have direct access to any product or products containing the active ingredient dextromethorphan prior to sale.
Sponsors
Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Jaime Williams [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-12 | Assembly | print number 263a |
2017-05-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |