NY A00238 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-01 - advanced to third reading cal.467
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-01 - advanced to third reading cal.467
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of corrections and community supervision to place incarcerated parents at correctional institutions and facilities closest to their children's home.
Title
Requires the department of corrections and community supervision to place incarcerated parents at correctional institutions and facilities closest to their children's home.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.467 |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-24 | Assembly | print number 238a |
2016-03-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01016 (Same As) 2016-03-24 - PRINT NUMBER 1016A