NY A00221 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes an occupancy tax in the village of Harrison.
Title
Imposes an occupancy tax in the village of Harrison.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-28 | Senate | tabled |
2015-12-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.309 |
2015-12-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1915 |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.318 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.318 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S00725 (Same As) 2015-01-07 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS