NY A00190 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various provisions regarding establishment of a hospital: provides that any person and various other listed entities (i.e., partnership, company, stockholder, member, corporation or other entity) with authority to operate a hospital, shall be subject to approval for establishment by the public health council (unless otherwise authorized to operate a hospital without such establishment approval); provides that any assignment or delegation of any authority to operate a hospital shall be subject to approval for establishment by the council (with certain specified exceptions); specifies circumstances under which a person, partnership, company, etc. shall be deemed to have authority to operate a hospital subject to approval for establishment by the council (with certain specified exceptions); specifies circumstances under which a person, partnership, company, etc. shall be deemed to have authority to operate a hospital (i.e., if it has decision-making authority over listed matters).
Title
Makes various provisions regarding establishment of a hospital: provides that any person and various other listed entities (i.e., partnership, company, stockholder, member, corporation or other entity) with authority to operate a hospital, shall be subject to approval for establishment by the public health council (unless otherwise authorized to operate a hospital without such establishment approval); provides that any assignment or delegation of any authority to operate a hospital shall be subject to approval for establishment by the council (with certain specified exceptions); specifies circumstances under which a person, partnership, company, etc. shall be deemed to have authority to operate a hospital subject to approval for establishment by the council (with certain specified exceptions); specifies circumstances under which a person, partnership, company, etc. shall be deemed to have authority to operate a hospital (i.e., if it has decision-making authority over listed matters).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.7 |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.58 |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |