NY A00146 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-13)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - print number 146a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "New York state living donor support act" to provide state reimbursement to living organ donors, who are state residents, for medical and associated expenses incurred as a result of the organ donation, when the organ donation is made to another resident of the state; requires the provision of information on transplantation to patients with severe kidney disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "New York state living donor support act" to provide state reimbursement to living organ donors, who are state residents, for medical and associated expenses incurred as a result of the organ donation, when the organ donation is made to another resident of the state; requires the provision of information on transplantation to patients with severe kidney disease.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08Assemblyprint number 146a
2021-02-08Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2021-02-02Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-01-06Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01594 (Same As) 2021-01-14 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback