NY S01594 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on December 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-29 - APPROVAL MEMO.84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on December 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-29 - APPROVAL MEMO.84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York state living donor support act" to provide state reimbursement to living organ donors, who are state residents, for medical and associated expenses incurred as a result of the organ donation, when the organ donation is made to another resident of the state; requires the provision of information on transplantation to patients with severe kidney disease.
Title
Enacts the "New York state living donor support act" to provide state reimbursement to living organ donors, who are state residents, for medical and associated expenses incurred as a result of the organ donation, when the organ donation is made to another resident of the state; requires the provision of information on transplantation to patients with severe kidney disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-29 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.84 |
2022-12-29 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.814 |
2022-12-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.515 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a146a |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.854 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00146 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - substituted by s1594