NY A00121 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to publishing records of public interest by agencies and the legislature on their websites.
Title
Relates to publishing records of public interest by agencies and the legislature on their websites.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | print number 121a |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01630 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES