NY A00121 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - RECOMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - RECOMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to meetings and absences of the board of regents.
Title
Relates to meetings and absences of the board of regents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.279 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6671 |
2014-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.8 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.686 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.686 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06671 (Same As) 2014-05-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A121