NY A00072 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the care of animals; requires regular diurnal light cycles of either natural or artificial light; requires separate space for pregnant or nursing dogs; requires a certain level of sanitation of primary enclosures and cages; requires sanitary food receptacles; requires grooming.
Title
Relates to the care of animals; requires regular diurnal light cycles of either natural or artificial light; requires separate space for pregnant or nursing dogs; requires a certain level of sanitation of primary enclosures and cages; requires sanitary food receptacles; requires grooming.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.7 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | amended on third reading 72a |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2017-06-19 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.130 |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S00613 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
S06784 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S06784 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES