NY A00068 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Passed on September 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-06 - signed chap.350
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Passed on September 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-06 - signed chap.350
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of education to issue guidance to school districts for developing programs to attract underrepresented candidates into the teaching profession and to identify funding available to school districts for such purposes.
Title
Directs the commissioner of education to issue guidance to school districts for developing programs to attract underrepresented candidates into the teaching profession and to identify funding available to school districts for such purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-06 | Assembly | signed chap.350 |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.287 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2140B |
2023-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.423 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.423 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | print number 68a |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2023-01-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02140 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A68A