NY A00061 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires businesses which provide for someone to spoof a telephone number to keep records of the phone calls placed with their services.
Title
Requires businesses which provide for someone to spoof a telephone number to keep records of the phone calls placed with their services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.4 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.180 |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.180 |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-01-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02318 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION