NY A00013 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-01 - print number 13a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-01 - print number 13a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York state YouthBuild act"; sets program requirements; authorizes grants to eligible YouthBuild participants and establishes application requirements.
Title
Enacts the "New York state YouthBuild act"; sets program requirements; authorizes grants to eligible YouthBuild participants and establishes application requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Assembly | print number 13a |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-01-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03738 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
S08073 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - referred to education
S08073 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - referred to education