NV SJR9 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - File No. 54.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - File No. 54.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the Director of the Bureau of Land Management to expedite the process for approving special recreation permits for certain uses of federal public lands in Nevada. (BDR R-1008)
Title
Urges the Director of the Bureau of Land Management to expedite the process for approving special recreation permits for certain uses of federal public lands in Nevada. (BDR R-1008)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | File No. 54. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2013-06-03 | Senate | To printer. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Assembly. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Senate. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 691 and further amend. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Assembly Amendment No. 691 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. |
2013-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 691 not concurred in. To Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 691.) To printer. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |