NV SJR8 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR8A
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - File No. 44.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - File No. 44.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing to amend the Nevada Constitution to guarantee equal rights.
Title
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to guarantee equal rights. (BDR C-1278)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | File No. 44. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 8, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Without recommendation. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR8 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - File No. 44.