NV SJR5 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - File No. 33.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - File No. 33.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to enact the Marketplace Fairness Act. (BDR R-890)
Title
Urges Congress to enact the Marketplace Fairness Act. (BDR R-890)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | Senate | File No. 33. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 7, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) Preamble adopted. To Assembly. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |