NV SJR14 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR14A
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - File No. 43.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - File No. 43.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise certain provisions relating to property taxes. (BDR C-1123)
Title
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise certain provisions relating to property taxes. (BDR C-1123)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | File No. 43. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) To Senate. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Waiver granted effective: April 13, 2017. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR14 (Carry Over) 2017-06-08 - File No. 43.