NV SCR10 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the Legislative Committee on Energy to conduct an interim study concerning the development of hydrogen, vanadium and lithium as energy resources in this State.
Title
Directs the Legislative Committee on Energy to conduct an interim study concerning the development of hydrogen, vanadium and lithium as energy resources in this State. (BDR R-523)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Resolution read and adopted, as amended. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Resolution read. Amended. (Amend. No. 757.) |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Resolution File. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |