NV SB98 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 160.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 160.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water; revising the boundaries of the Carson Water Subconservancy District and the membership of the Board of Directors of the District; requiring, under certain circumstances, the Board of County Commissioners of Storey County to pay to the District a certain amount from the County's general fund; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes to provisions relating to the Carson Water Subconservancy District. (BDR S-579)
Sponsors
Sen. James Settelmeyer [R] | Sen. Pete Goicoechea [R] | Rep. Jim Wheeler [R] | Sen. Carrie Buck [R] |
Sen. Ben Kieckhefer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Chapter 160. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |