NV SB94 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public nuisances; providing that an unlocked gate does not, in and of itself, constitute a public nuisance; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that an unlocked gate does not, in and of itself, constitute a public nuisance. (BDR 15-440)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2021-04-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-04-20SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2021-04-20SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 350.) To printer.
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-02-04SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2021-02-03SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback