NV SB93 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to Medicaid; authorizing a recipient of Medicaid to receive reimbursements for personal care services; suspending eligibility for Medicaid of a person who is incarcerated to the extent possible; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to Medicaid. (BDR 38-193)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | To Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To printer. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 701.) |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |