NV SB78 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 403.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 403.
Summary
Authorizes the Division of Mental Health and Developmental Services of the Department of Health and Human Services to regulate the provision of certain services to persons with mental retardation and persons with related conditions. (BDR 39-338)
Title
Authorizes the Division of Mental Health and Developmental Services of the Department of Health and Human Services to regulate the provision of certain services to persons with mental retardation and persons with related conditions. (BDR 39-338)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 403. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-29 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. | |
2009-04-29 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-28 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-24 | From committee: Do pass, as amended. | |
2009-04-16 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-04-16 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. | |
2009-04-15 | Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer. | |
2009-04-15 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-04-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 458.) | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-17 | From printer. | |
2008-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=159 |