NV SB72 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 42.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 42.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to gaming; authorizing the Nevada Gaming Control Board to temporarily suspend the registration of a registered gaming employee upon his or her arrest by an agent of the Board; requiring the Nevada Gaming Commission to adopt regulations relating to such temporary suspensions of registration; establishing provisions relating to certain approvals sought from the Board; revising certain definitions; revising provisions relating to actions and proceedings of the Board that are exempt from the Open Meeting Law; revising provisions concerning the filing of a change of employment notice by certain registered gaming employees; revising provisions relating to the submission of an application for registration or renewal of registration as a gaming employee or a change of employment notice to the Board; requiring an applicant for registration or renewal of registration as a gaming employee to submit certain fees to the Central Repository for Nevada Records of Criminal History; revising provisions concerning the submission of such an applicant's fingerprints; revising provisions relating to the suspension of or objection to the registration of an applicant as a gaming employee; revising provisions relating to the revocation of registration as a gaming employee; revising provisions relating to associated equipment; revising the legislative findings relating to hosting centers; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes related to gaming. (BDR 41-344)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 42. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 80.) To printer. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-24 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |