NV SB55 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 322.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 322.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to employee leasing companies; transferring the duties for the licensing and certain regulation of certain companies which lease employees from the Administrator of the Division of Industrial Relations of the Department of Business and Industry to the Labor Commissioner; authorizing the Labor Commissioner to impose administrative penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the licensing and regulation of employee leasing companies. (BDR 53-317)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 322. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 11.) To Senate. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 3.) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |