NV SB520 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT making a supplemental appropriation to the State Distributive School Account for an unanticipated increase in K-12 enrollment for the 2017-2018 and 2018-2019 school years; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes a supplemental appropriation to the State Distributive School Account for an unanticipated increase in K-12 enrollment for the 2017-2018 and 2018-2019 school years. (BDR S-1231)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2019-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-15SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 684.) To printer.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-05-01SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-04-30SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback