NV SB503 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 544.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the creation and implementation of the Breakfast After the Bell Program. (BDR 34-1200)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the creation and implementation of the Breakfast After the Bell Program. (BDR 34-1200)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 544.
2015-06-01SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-29SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2015-05-28AssemblyTo Senate.
2015-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.)
2015-05-27AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-05-26AssemblyRead second time.
2015-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-05-01AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2015-05-01AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-30SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 2, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
2015-04-29SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-04-29SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2015-04-28SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 648.) To printer.
2015-04-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-16SenateExemption effective.
2015-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2015-04-16SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2015-04-16SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 510.)
2015-04-16SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-30SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2015-03-26SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback