NV SB503 | 2013 | 77th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Chapter 273.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to drivers' licenses and identification cards. (BDR 43-1159)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to drivers' licenses and identification cards. (BDR 43-1159)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-29SenateChapter 273.
2013-05-29SenateApproved by the Governor.
2013-05-28SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2013-05-27SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2013-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2013-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-21AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-20AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-18AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-17AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-16AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-14AssemblyRead second time.
2013-05-14AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2013-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2013-04-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
2013-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly.
2013-04-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2013-04-22SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2013-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 426.) To printer.
2013-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2013-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-03-27SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2013-03-25SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback