NV SB498 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 531.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 531.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to mortgage brokers, mortgage agents and mortgage bankers. (BDR 54-484)
Title
Revises provisions relating to mortgage brokers, mortgage agents and mortgage bankers. (BDR 54-484)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 531. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . To Assembly. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | To printer. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 964.) |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 623.) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-24 | Senate | To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Action of re-referral rescinded. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 384.) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |