NV SB477 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 402.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 402.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Administrator of the Division of Health Care Financing and Policy of the Department of Health and Human Services to administer oaths, take testimony and issue subpoenas for the purposes of recovering Medicaid benefits paid on behalf of certain recipients. (BDR 38-1195)
Title
Authorizes the Administrator of the Division of Health Care Financing and Policy of the Department of Health and Human Services to administer oaths, take testimony and issue subpoenas for the purposes of recovering Medicaid benefits paid on behalf of certain recipients. (BDR 38-1195)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 402. | |
2011-06-06 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-05 | To enrollment. | |
2011-06-05 | In Senate. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-06-01 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-06-01 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-05-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2011-05-27 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-25 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-14 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-14 | Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2011-04-14 | Read second time. | |
2011-04-11 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-04 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-03-30 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-28 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |