NV SB468 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes a supplemental appropriation to the Department of Business and Industry for a shortfall in projected personnel costs of the Nevada Transportation Authority. (BDR S-1243)
Title
Makes a supplemental appropriation to the Department of Business and Industry for a shortfall in projected personnel costs of the Nevada Transportation Authority. (BDR S-1243)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2015-03-29 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1019 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SB/SB468.pdf |