NV SB462 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the Central Repository for Nevada Records of Criminal History within the Department of Public Safety for the initial phase of the project to modernize the Nevada Criminal Justice Information System. (BDR S-1184)
Title
Makes an appropriation to the Central Repository for Nevada Records of Criminal History within the Department of Public Safety for the initial phase of the project to modernize the Nevada Criminal Justice Information System. (BDR S-1184)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 517. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | To committee. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |