NV SB459 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state employees; authorizing collective bargaining for certain state employees; renaming and expanding the duties of the Local Government Employee-Management Relations Board; providing for the recognition of professional organizations; providing for the establishment of bargaining units and the designation of bargaining agents; establishing procedures for collective bargaining and for making collective bargaining agreements; prohibiting certain unfair labor practices; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for collective bargaining by certain state employees. (BDR 23-536)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2019-04-23SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-22SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 540.)
2019-04-22SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-26SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback