NV SB459 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Chapter 247.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Chapter 247.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes a supplemental appropriation to and authorizes the expenditure of certain money by the Division of Health Care Financing and Policy of the Department of Health and Human Services for an unanticipated increase in caseloads for medical services and certain other costs. (BDR S-1190)
Title
Makes a supplemental appropriation to and authorizes the expenditure of certain money by the Division of Health Care Financing and Policy of the Department of Health and Human Services for an unanticipated increase in caseloads for medical services and certain other costs. (BDR S-1190)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Senate | Chapter 247. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 596.) To printer. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |