NV SB446 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 514.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to businesses. (BDR 7-1088)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to businesses. (BDR 7-1088)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-10SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 514.
2015-05-28SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-25SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2015-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2015-05-21AssemblyRead second time.
2015-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-04-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-16AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-15SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2015-04-15SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-14SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 347.) To printer.
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-24SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback