NV SB443 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 344.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 344.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to agriculture; defining certain terms that apply to standards that govern seeds; revising the definition for certifying agency; requiring certain containers of seeds to bear or have attached a sell-by date which contains certain information; requiring containers for seeds of agricultural crops to include certain additional information if the seeds are coated; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to agriculture. (BDR 51-1084)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 344. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 9, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |