NV SB440 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to transportation. (BDR 58-983)
Title
Revises provisions relating to transportation. (BDR 58-983)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | To printer. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 8, Excused: 2.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1067.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-05-15 | Assembly | Waiver granted effective: May 15, 2015. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 486.) To printer. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |