NV SB437 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-31 - Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-31 - Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to justice courts; increasing the fee charged for certain actions and proceedings in justice courts; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Increases the fee charged for certain actions and proceedings in justice courts. (BDR 1-1079)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Action of refusal of passage reconsidered. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |