NV SB435 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 429.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 429.
Summary
Makes corrections to certain legislative measures. (BDR S-1328)
Title
Makes corrections to certain legislative measures. (BDR S-1328)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 429. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-29 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-28 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-27 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-05-27 | Read third time. | |
2009-05-27 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-27 | Action of referral rescinded. | |
2009-05-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2009-05-27 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-26 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-26 | From printer. | |
2009-05-26 | To printer. | |
2009-05-26 | Read first time. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1165 |